EP0470966 - SIMULTANEOUS DUAL ANALYTE ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hygeia Sciences, Inc. c/o Carter-Wallace, Inc., 1345 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10105 / US | [1996/28] |
Former [1992/08] | For all designated states Hygeia Sciences, Inc. 330 Nevada Street Newton Massachusetts 02160-1432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAHAR, Izak 34 Byron Road, Apt. No. 3 Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | 02 /
COLE, Francis, X. 75 Kirkland Drive Stow, MA 01775 / US | 03 /
CANNON, L., Edward 6 Nolan Farms Wayland, MA 01778 / US | [1992/08] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1995/28] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham, et al Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1992/08] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90905904.0 | 07.03.1990 | [1992/08] | WO1990US01227 | Priority number, date | US19890326337 | 21.03.1989 Original published format: US 326337 | [1992/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9011521 | Date: | 04.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470966 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470966 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/74, G01N33/58 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
G01N33/743 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/972 (EP,US);
Y10S436/819 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/08] | G01N33/535 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | GLEICHZEITIGES TESTVERFAHREN ZWEIER ANALYTEN | [1992/08] | English: | SIMULTANEOUS DUAL ANALYTE ASSAY | [1992/08] | French: | EXAMEN DE DEUX ANALYTES EN SIMULTANE | [1992/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1991 | Search fee paid | 18.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Request for further processing for: | 25.12.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 26.12.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2029011 (COULSON W, et al); | [Y]EP0086095 (BAKER TERENCE S [GB], et al); | [Y]US4506009 (LENHOFF HOWARD M [US], et al); | [YP]US4853335 (OLSEN DUANE A [US], et al) |