EP0467948 - COMPOSITE CERAMIC MATERIAL AND METHOD TO MANUFACTURE THE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STIFTELSEN CENTRUM FÖR ORAL BIOLOGI Institutionsvägen 6 Plan 7 S-141 04 Huddinge / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states STIFTELSEN CENTRUM FÖR ORAL BIOLOGI Institutionsvägen 6 Plan 7 S-141 04 Huddinge / SE | ||
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states STIFTELSEN CENTRUM FÖR DENTALTEKNIK OCH BIOMATERIAL I HUDDINGE Institutionsvägen 6 Plan 7 S-141 04 Huddinge / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMANSSON, Leif Brunnsgarden S-740 20 Brunna / SE | 02 /
FORBERG, Sevald Bastuhagsvägen 35 S-122 42 Enskede / SE | 03 /
JIANGOU, Li Wenner-Gren Center Sveavägen 166 S-113 46 Stockholm / SE | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [1992/05] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB Box 236 S-683 02 Hagfors / SE | Application number, filing date | 90906419.8 | 30.03.1990 | [1992/05] | WO1990SE00207 | Priority number, date | SE19890001294 | 10.04.1989 Original published format: SE 8901294 | [1992/05] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9011979 | Date: | 18.10.1990 | [1990/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467948 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0467948 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, A61L27/00, A61K6/06 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
A61L27/427 (EP,US);
C04B35/117 (EP,US);
C04B35/119 (EP,US);
C04B35/46 (EP,US);
C04B35/488 (EP,US);
C04B35/49 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/05] | Title | German: | KOMPOSIT-KERAMISCHES MATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1992/05] | English: | COMPOSITE CERAMIC MATERIAL AND METHOD TO MANUFACTURE THE MATERIAL | [1992/05] | French: | MATIERE CERAMIQUE COMPOSITE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1992/05] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.1990 | Translation filed | 12.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/05] | 03.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 03.04.1996 | [1996/38] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2928007 (RIESS GUIDO DR); | [X]DE3301122 (OSBORN JOHANNES FRIEDRICH DR) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 108, No. 2, 11 January 1988, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 336, Abstract 11277v, & JP,, 62142565 (TAMATOSHI NOBUYUKI) 1987. | [A] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT No 87-281769/40, JP 62197066, publ.week 8740, Dialog Information Service, File 351, WPI. |