EP0482000 - MANUFACTURE OF ARTIFICIAL TEETH AND CROWNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.1994 [1994/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTSAERT, Henri L 42 Brentwood Drive Dundas, Ontario L8T 3V8 / CA | [1992/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 B-1080 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 90906802.5 | 11.05.1990 | [1992/18] | WO1990CA00152 | Priority number, date | US19890350964 | 12.05.1989 Original published format: US 350964 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013268 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482000 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482000 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/08, A61C5/10 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
A61C13/09 (EP,US);
A61C13/0003 (EP,US);
A61C13/0022 (EP,US);
A61C13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1992/18] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON KÜNSTLICHEN ZÄHNEN UND KRONEN | [1992/18] | English: | MANUFACTURE OF ARTIFICIAL TEETH AND CROWNS | [1992/18] | French: | FABRICATION DE DENTS ARTIFICIELLES ET DE COURONNES | [1992/18] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 16.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.02.1992 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 | 19.02.1992 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 | 19.02.1992 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 | 19.02.1992 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 | 19.02.1992 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 | 19.02.1992 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 | 19.02.1992 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.01.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   19.02.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0160797 [ ] (MORMANN WERNER H [CH], et al) |