EP0479792 - VEHICLE-OCCUPANT SAFETY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/16] | VEHICLE-OCCUPANT SAFETY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SYSTEM | ||
[1994/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELLER, Hugo Moerikestra e 5 D-7141 Oberriexingen / DE | 02 /
TAUFER, Peter Talstra e 43 D-7253 Renningen 2 / DE | 03 /
BALZER, Knut Eglosheimer Stra e 33 D-7140 Ludwigsburg-Pflugfelden / DE | 04 /
BURGER, Wilfried Bahnhofstra e 97 D-7254 Hemmingen / DE | [1992/16] | Application number, filing date | 90906861.1 | 16.05.1990 | [1992/16] | WO1990DE00364 | Priority number, date | DE19893921250 | 29.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3921250 | [1992/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9100200 | Date: | 10.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479792 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479792 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/00, G06F11/00 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B60R21/0132 (EP,US);
B60R21/00 (KR);
B60R21/013 (US);
G06F11/0796 (EP,US);
G06F11/1497 (EP,US);
B60R2021/0119 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1992/16] | Title | German: | INSASSEN-SICHERHEITSSYSTEM | [1994/07] | English: | VEHICLE-OCCUPANT SAFETY SYSTEM | [1994/07] | French: | SYSTEME DE SECURITE POUR LES OCCUPANTS D'UNE VOITURE | [1994/07] |
Former [1992/16] | INSASSEN-SICHERHEITSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DESSELBEN | ||
Former [1992/16] | VEHICLE-OCCUPANT SAFETY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF OPERATING THE SYSTEM | ||
Former [1992/16] | SYSTEME DE SECURITE POUR LES OCCUPANTS D'UNE VOITURE ET PROCEDE POUR SA MISE EN UVRE | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0115222 (TEC TECH EUROP DE COMMUTATION [FR]); | [A]FR2606897 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]EP0283737 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0305656 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) |