EP0471700 - TWO-LINE CREST FILTER WITH SPATIAL MIXING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | For all designated states ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Zenith Center 1000 Milwaukee Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025-2493 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
For all designated states ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORPORATION Zenith Center 1000 Milwaukee Avenue Glenview Illinois 60025-2493 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHOSRO, Rabii 3827 Galena Crt. Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | 02 /
KOHNE, Heinrich Bòhlackerstrasse 7 D-7801 V rstettenn 13 / DE | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90906923.9 | 08.05.1990 | [1992/09] | WO1990EP00738 | Priority number, date | US19890349192 | 09.05.1989 Original published format: US 349192 | [1992/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9013978 | Date: | 15.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471700 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471700 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/78 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
H04N9/78 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1992/09] | Title | German: | ZWEIZEILENKAMMFILTERUNG MIT RÄUMLICHER MISCHUNG | [1992/09] | English: | TWO-LINE CREST FILTER WITH SPATIAL MIXING | [1992/09] | French: | FILTRAGE EN PEIGNE BILIGNE AVEC MELANGE SPATIAL | [1992/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP63206090 [ ]; | EP0161923 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | [ ] - IEEE Transactions on Consumer Electronics, Band CE-33, Nr. 3, August 1987, IEEE, (New York, US), Y. NISHIGORI et al.: "A Two Dimensional Adaptive Digital Decoder for Color Television Signals", seiten 91-96 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 12, Nr. 493 (E-697) (3340), 22. Dezember 1988; & JP-A-63206090 (NEC Home Electronics Ltd) 25. August 1988, & JP63206090 A 00000000 |