EP0471741 - POWER TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TARGETT POWER EQUIPMENT SERVICES (SCUNTHORPE) LIMITED 3 Menasha Way Queensway Industrial Estate Scunthorpe South Humberside DN16 3RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states TARGETT POWER EQUIPMENT SERVICES (SCUNTHORPE) LIMITED 3 Menasha Way Queensway Industrial Estate Scunthorpe, South Humberside DN16 3RT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARGETT, Derrick, Russell The Old Rectory Somerby Barnetby South Humberside / GB | 02 /
BAGSHAW, Roger 71 Greengate Road Woodhouse Sheffield S13 7QA / GB | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough, Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | Archer, Philip Bruce, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord European Patent Attorneys New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90907360.3 | 03.05.1990 | [1992/09] | WO1990GB00682 | Priority number, date | GB19890011027 | 13.05.1989 Original published format: GB 8911027 | [1992/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9014199 | Date: | 29.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471741 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B25H1/00 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
B25H1/0071 (EP,US);
Y10T408/03 (EP,US);
Y10T408/554 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [1992/09] | Title | German: | KRAFTBETRIEBENE GERÄTE | [1992/09] | English: | POWER TOOLS | [1992/09] | French: | OUTILS MOTORISES | [1992/09] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/25] | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3042873 (IMAI TETSUKOJO OHTA KK [JP]); | [Y]US3014751 (SMITH CLOYD D); | [Y]DE1002592 (DEUTSCHE EDELSTAHLWERKE AG); | [Y]GB865502 (JOACHIM ANTON BESUCH); | [Y]FR1249612 (JAMUL CORP); | [A]DE3134619 (NITTO KOHKI CO [JP]); | [A]DE2552742 (MASCH UND FORMENBAU GMBH); | [A]JPS59124504 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 244 (M-337)(1681) 09 November 1984, & JP-A-59 124504 (SANKIYOUGUMI KOGYOSHO K.K.) 18 July 1984see the whole document | [A] - MACHINERY. vol. 78, no. 6, June 1972NEW YORK US page 86 "HAND-TAPPING GUIDE" see the whole document |