EP0440799 - SUPERCONDUCTIVE WIRE MATERIAL AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIURA, Ohsuke Kanagawa-ryo 211, Oguchinakacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Kaname Furukawadenko-shataku 34-5, Miyagaya Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Yasuzo 8-6, Takinoue Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
SHIGA, Shoji 771-2, Shukugocho Utsunomiya-shi Tochigi / JP | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90907477.5 | 28.05.1990 | [1991/33] | WO1990JP00680 | Priority number, date | JP19890219385 | 25.08.1989 Original published format: JP 21938589 | JP19900001400 | 08.01.1990 Original published format: JP 140090 | JP19900012886 | 23.01.1990 Original published format: JP 1288690 | JP19900060757 | 12.03.1990 Original published format: JP 6075790 | [1991/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103060 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0440799 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440799 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01B12/10, H01B13/00 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
H10N60/20 (EP);
H10N60/01 (EP);
H10N60/0184 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/33] | Title | German: | SUPRALEITFÄHIGES DRAHTMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1991/33] | English: | SUPERCONDUCTIVE WIRE MATERIAL AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME | [1991/33] | French: | MATERIAU FILAIRE SUPRACONDUCTEUR ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN TEL MATERIAU | [1991/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1990 | Translation filed | 29.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 29.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 18.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3465430 (BARBER ANTHONY CLIFFORD, et al); | [A]US4078299 (FURUTO YOSHIO, et al); | [X]GB2038532 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | [X]US4803310 (ZEITLIN BRUCE A [US], et al) | International search | [X]JPS525239B ; | [X]JPS5539845B ; | [X]US4414428 (MCDONALD WILLIAM K [US]); | [X]JPS61174366 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPS61174365 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPS61232510 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [X]JPS62110208 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [X]JPS62110207 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [X]JPS62211358 (FUJIKURA LTD); | [Y]JPS62283505 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES); | [E]JPH02148517 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) |