EP0428747 - METHOD AND APPARATUS OF FILTERING MEDIUM CIRCULATION TYPE FOR PURIFYING CONTAMINATED WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IWAI, Isamu 12-14, Shimosueyoshi 1-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230 / JP | For all designated states NIRASAWA, Chikatsu 13-7, Bunnka 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | [1991/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Gold, Tibor Zoltán, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Gold, Tibor Z., et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90907490.8 | 23.05.1990 | [1991/22] | WO1990JP00659 | Priority number, date | JP19890134314 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13431489 | [1991/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9014313 | Date: | 29.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428747 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428747 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.11.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/08, C02F3/10 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
C02F3/2873 (EP);
C02F3/08 (KR);
B01D24/28 (EP);
C02F3/087 (EP);
C02F3/10 (KR);
C02F3/223 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG VOM TYP DES ZIRKULIERENDEN FILTERMEDIUMS ZUR REINIGUNG VON VERUNREINIGTEM WASSER | [1991/22] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS OF FILTERING MEDIUM CIRCULATION TYPE FOR PURIFYING CONTAMINATED WATER | [1991/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DU TYPE A CIRCULATION DE MILIEU FILTRANT POUR LA PURIFICATION D'EAU CONTAMINEE | [1991/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1991 | Translation filed | 28.12.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.1990 | Search fee paid | 28.12.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Request for further processing for: | 04.07.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 05.07.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.07.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.05.1995 | DK | 23.05.1995 | GB | 23.05.1995 | ES | 24.05.1995 | SE | 24.05.1995 | BE | 31.05.1995 | CH | 31.05.1995 | LI | 31.05.1995 | LU | 31.05.1995 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 23.05.1995 | |
DK | 23.05.1995 | ||
GB | 23.05.1995 | ||
SE | 24.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
CH | 31.05.1995 | ||
LI | 31.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 23.05.1995 | |
DK | 23.05.1995 | ||
GB | 23.05.1995 | ||
SE | 24.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
CH | 31.05.1995 | ||
LI | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 23.05.1995 | |
DK | 23.05.1995 | ||
GB | 23.05.1995 | ||
SE | 24.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | DK | 23.05.1995 | |
GB | 23.05.1995 | ||
SE | 24.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | GB | 23.05.1995 | |
SE | 24.05.1995 | ||
BE | 31.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/15] | GB | 23.05.1995 | |
SE | 24.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 24.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | JPH06340597B [ ]; | JP6244799Y [ ]; | JP6242799Y [ ]; | JPS57132592 [ ] (EBARA INFILCO); | JPS62262794 [ ] (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD); | JPH0612440B [ ] |