EP0531281 - METHOD OF PRODUCING PERMANENT MAGNETS BY POLAR ANISOTROPIC ORIENTATION MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, J., Kelly 15 Country Club Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | 02 /
FURLANI, Edward, P. 28 Deerpath Drive Lancaster, NY 14086 / US | 03 /
VIGODA, Abraham, M. 85 Chadwick Drive Rochester, NY 14618 / US | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Buff, Michel, et al KODAK INDUSTRIE Département Brevets - CRT Zone Industrielle - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Buff, Michel, et al Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90907699.4 | 24.05.1990 | [1993/11] | WO1990US02755 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118405 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531281 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531281 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/02 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
H01F41/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PERMANENTMAGNETEN DURCH POLARE ANISOTROPISCHE ORIENTIERUNGSFORMUNG | [1993/11] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING PERMANENT MAGNETS BY POLAR ANISOTROPIC ORIENTATION MOLDING | [1993/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'AIMANTS PERMANENTS PAR MOULAGE A ORIENTATION ANISOTROPE POLAIRE | [1993/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP59168620 ; | [X]JP59220911 ; | [A]JP62271408 ; | [A]JP62250621 ; | [X]FR1169708 ; | [X]CH428967 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 19 (E-292)(1742) 25 January 1985, & JP-A-59 168620 (DAIDO TOKUSHUKO K.K.) see the whole document, & JP59168620 A 19850125 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 89 (E-309)(1812) 18 April 1985, & JP-A-59 220911 (RICOH K.K.) see the whole document, & JP59220911 A 19850418 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 158 (E-608)(3005) 13 May 1988, & JP-A-62 271408 (CANON INC) see the whole document, & JP62271408 A 19880513 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 124 (E-601)(2971) 16 April 1988, & JP-A-62 250621 (CANON INC) see the whole document, & JP62250621 A 19880416 | Examination | JP59168620 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OFJAPAN, Vol. 9, No. 19 (E-292)(1742) 25 January 1985, & JP-A-59 168620, & JP59168620 A 19850125 |