EP0470177 - FUNGICIDAL OXIME CARBAMATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTZELL, Stephen, Lee 2017 Oak Lane Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / US | [1992/07] | Representative(s) | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Hildyard, Edward Martin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90907790.1 | 24.04.1990 | [1992/07] | WO1990US02124 | Priority number, date | US19890342876 | 25.04.1989 Original published format: US 342876 | US19890398266 | 24.08.1989 Original published format: US 398266 | [1992/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9012784 | Date: | 01.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470177 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/60, C07C259/02, C07C317/28, C07C327/40, C07D295/15, C07F9/09, A01N37/52, A01N41/10, A01N47/10, A01N57/02 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
C07D213/79 (EP);
C07C271/60 (EP,KR);
A01N37/52 (EP);
A01N43/08 (EP);
A01N43/10 (EP);
A01N43/40 (EP);
A01N43/42 (EP);
A01N45/02 (EP);
A01N47/06 (EP);
A01N47/24 (EP);
A01N47/42 (EP);
A01N51/00 (EP);
A01N57/12 (EP);
C07C259/02 (EP);
C07C309/46 (EP);
C07C309/65 (EP);
C07C309/66 (EP);
C07C309/73 (EP);
C07C309/76 (EP);
C07C309/77 (EP);
C07C309/89 (EP);
C07C311/16 (EP);
C07C311/32 (EP);
C07C311/47 (EP);
C07C317/18 (EP);
C07C317/22 (EP);
C07C317/24 (EP);
C07C317/28 (EP);
C07C317/42 (EP);
C07C317/44 (EP);
C07C323/12 (EP);
C07C323/19 (EP);
C07C323/25 (EP);
C07C323/43 (EP);
C07C323/45 (EP);
C07C323/52 (EP);
C07C323/62 (EP);
C07C325/02 (EP);
C07C327/40 (EP);
C07C327/42 (EP);
C07C329/06 (EP);
C07C331/08 (EP);
C07C331/12 (EP);
C07C333/12 (EP);
C07C381/14 (EP);
C07D213/80 (EP);
C07D213/84 (EP);
C07D215/48 (EP);
C07D215/54 (EP);
C07D231/12 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D239/42 (EP);
C07D241/44 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP);
C07D295/155 (EP);
C07D295/185 (EP);
C07D295/194 (EP);
C07D307/68 (EP);
C07D307/85 (EP);
C07D333/20 (EP);
C07D333/24 (EP);
C07D333/38 (EP);
C07D333/68 (EP);
C07D333/70 (EP);
C07F9/095 (EP);
C07F9/097 (EP);
C07F9/3294 (EP);
C07F9/409 (EP);
C07C2601/02 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP);
C07C2601/18 (EP);
C07C2603/18 (EP);
C07C2603/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/07] | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE OXIMCARBAMATE | [1992/07] | English: | FUNGICIDAL OXIME CARBAMATES | [1992/07] | French: | CARBAMATES D'OXYME FONGICIDES | [1992/07] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 04.08.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1806120 (AGRIPAT SA); | [X]DE2134332 ; | FR2327984 [ ] (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]); | [X]DE2621102 (SCHERING AG); | [A]GB2028797 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [X]EP0010588 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [X]US4272453 (BOOTH DAVID L, et al) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 81, 1974, (Columbus, Ohio, US), H. BRACHWITZ: "Hydroximic Acid Derivative. VIII. Reduction of Hydroximix Acid Derivatives", see page 491* Abstract 120126q, & Z. Chem. 1974, 14(7)268-9 & Generic DARC Online Graphic of Chem. Abs. Reg. No. 23477-23-8* | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 71, 1969, (Columbus, Ohio, US), YU. L. KRUGLYAK et al.: "Phosphorylated Oximes. VI. Reaction of Salts of Nitro Carboxylic Acid Esters with Diethyl Chlorophosphite", see page 283* Abstract 101249j, & Zh. Obshch. Khim. 1969, 39(6)8 1263-4 & Generic DARC Online Graphics of Chem. Abs. Reg. Nos. 25328-82-9, 25309-11-9, 25309-10-825309-09-5* | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 95, 1981, (Columbus, Ohio, US), K. HARADA et al.: "The Synthetic Reactions of Aliphatic Nitro Compounds. Part XVII. Synthesis of Five-Membered Heterocycles Containing a Nitrogen-Oxygen Bond via O-Acylation of Aliptatic Nitro Compounds", see page 732* Abstract 169077c, & Chem. Pharm. Bull. 1980, 28(11)3296-303 & Generic DARC Online Graphics of Chem. Abs. Reg. Nos. 77597-0-6-9 and 69337-38-8* | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 106, 1987, (Columbus, Ohio, US), T. SHIMIZU et al.: "Convenient Preparative Method of Nitrile Oxides by the Dehydration of Primary Nitro Compounds with Ethyl Chloroformate or Benzenesulfonyl Chloride in the Presence of Triethylamine", see page 734* Abstract 196306d, & Bull. Chem. Soc. Jpn. 1986, 59(9)2827-31 & Generic DARC Online Graphic of Chem. Abs. Reg. No. 108199-01-5* |