EP0474707 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE TIMING ANGLE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLMANN, Siegfried St. Michaelstrasse 6 D-8000 München 80 / DE | 02 /
WIER, Manfred Ahornweg 2 D-8411 Wenzenbach / DE | [1992/12] | Application number, filing date | 90908457.6 | 01.06.1990 | [1992/12] | WO1990DE00426 | Priority number, date | DE19893917906 | 01.06.1989 Original published format: DE 3917906 | [1992/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015244 | Date: | 13.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474707 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02P5/15 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
F02P5/1455 (EP);
F02P5/152 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/12] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR REGULUNG DES ZÜNDWINKELS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [1992/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE TIMING ANGLE OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1992/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DE L'ANGLE DE CAME DE MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1992/12] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/32] | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4481925 [ ] (KARAU PHILIP A [US], et al); | GB2186634 [ ] (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | EP0203617 [ ] (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |