EP0473678 - SPOUT FOR FLASKS AND SIMILAR RECEPTACLES, WITH A PIERCING ELEMENT FOR PIERCING A LID ON RECEPTACLE NECKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RICAL S.A. 1, boulevard Eiffel, B.P. 96 21603 Longvic / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states RICAL S.A. 1, boulevard Eiffel F-21603 Longvic / FR | ||
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states RICAL S.A. 4, rue Romelet, Z.I. de Longvic F-21600 Longvic / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELLERANO, Pierre 155, rue du Faubourg-Poissonnière F-75009 Paris / FR | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/11] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90908554.0 | 17.05.1990 | [1992/11] | WO1990FR00347 | Priority number, date | FR19890006434 | 17.05.1989 Original published format: FR 8906434 | [1992/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9014288 | Date: | 29.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473678 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473678 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/36, B65D51/22 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
B65D51/226 (EP,US);
B65D47/36 (EP,US);
B65D51/224 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0025 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0056 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/11] | Title | German: | AUSGIESSER FÜR FLAKONS ODER DERGLEICHEN MIT EINEM ELEMENT ZUM DURCHSTECHEN EINER VERSCHLUSSMEMBRAN | [1992/11] | English: | SPOUT FOR FLASKS AND SIMILAR RECEPTACLES, WITH A PIERCING ELEMENT FOR PIERCING A LID ON RECEPTACLE NECKS | [1992/11] | French: | VERSEUR POUR DES FLACONS ET RECIPIENTS ANALOGUES, AVEC UN ELEMENT PERCEUR POUR PERCER UN OPERCULE DU GOULOT DES RECIPIENTS | [1992/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB1152931 [ ] (APPLIC TECH ET IND S A T I SA [FR]); | EP0304972 [ ] (LYNES HOLDING SA [LU]); | EP0316269 [ ] (SOPLAR SA [CH]); | EP0214095 [ ] |