EP0476024 - OPTICAL FIBRE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANC, Floréal 24, rue Blin F-91370 Verrières-le-Buisson / FR | 02 /
MONGIN, Roger 9, rue Rondelet F-75012 Paris / FR | 03 /
PHILIP, Thierry 1186, avenue Brigan-Braquet Appt. B4 F-30200 Bagnols-sur-Cèze / FR | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1992/13] | Application number, filing date | 90909449.2 | 07.06.1990 | [1992/13] | WO1990FR00402 | Priority number, date | FR19890007596 | 08.06.1989 Original published format: FR 8907596 | [1992/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015350 | Date: | 13.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476024 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476024 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
G02B6/3897 (EP,US);
G02B6/3825 (EP);
G02B6/3849 (EP);
G02B6/3873 (EP);
G02B6/3885 (EP);
G02B6/3888 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/13] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG FÜR GLASFASERN | [1992/13] | English: | OPTICAL FIBRE CONNECTOR | [1992/13] | French: | CONNECTEUR POUR FIBRES OPTIQUES | [1992/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | WO8400617 [ ] (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | EP0166636 [ ] (RADIALL IND [FR]); | FR2588387 [ ] (SOCAPEX [FR]); | EP0258964 [ ] (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) |