EP0477250 - PLUG-IN TRANSIENT VOLTAGE SUPPRESSOR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Change - applicant | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine Illinois 60067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 South Roselle Road, Executive Plaza Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | ||
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states SQUARE D COMPANY 1415 S. Roselle Road Palatine, IL 60067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADY, Peter, J. 5519 West Paradise Lane Glendale, AZ 85306 / US | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Sorrell, Terence Gordon Fitzpatricks, Cardinal Court, 23, Thomas More Street London E1 9YY / GB | [1992/17] |
Former [1992/14] | Sorrell, Terence Gordon Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 90909504.4 | 11.06.1990 | [1992/14] | WO1990US03297 | Priority number, date | US19890367028 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: US 367028 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9016103 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477250 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
H02H9/044 (EP,US);
H02H9/042 (EP,US);
H01H2071/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/14] | Title | German: | STECKBARES TRANSIENTE SPANNUNGEN UNTERDRÜCKENDES MODUL | [1992/14] | English: | PLUG-IN TRANSIENT VOLTAGE SUPPRESSOR MODULE | [1992/14] | French: | MODULE ENFICHABLE DE SUPPRESSION DE TENSION TRANSITOIRE | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1992 | Search fee paid | 13.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4023071 (FUSSELL GERALD W); | [Y]US4587588 (GOLDSTEIN RICHARD [US]); | [Y]US4740859 (LITTLE HERCEL A [US]) |