EP0480953 - SCANNING AND EXCITING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Postfach 1307 D-78003 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUCKER, Friedhelm Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 8 D-7733 Mönchweiler / DE | [1992/17] | Application number, filing date | 90909649.7 | 13.06.1990 | [1992/17] | WO1990EP00926 | Priority number, date | DE19893922068 | 05.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3922068 | [1992/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9100600 | Date: | 10.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480953 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11C27/02 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
G11C27/02 (KR);
G11C27/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/17] | Title | German: | ABTAST- UND HALTEGLIED | [1992/17] | English: | SCANNING AND EXCITING ELEMENT | [1992/17] | French: | ELEMENT D'ECHANTILLONNAGE ET D'ENTRETIEN | [1992/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 09.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/28] | 26.02.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0260375 [ ] (SEQUENCE INC [US]); | US3701152 [ ] (HOWARD HAROLD K); | DE2455517 [ ] (YAMATAKE HONEYWELL CO LTD) |