EP0478657 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR HANDLING A COIL OF METAL PACKING WIRE INTENDED FOR PACKING PULP BALES, FOR EXAMPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACWIRE AB Gunnebovägen 860 35 Söraker / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states PACWIRE AB Gunnebovägen S-860 35 Söraker / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSON, Bengt Drevstigen 5 S-852 57 Sundsvall / SE | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Horney, Johan, et al Albihn Holmqvist AB, P.O. Box 3137 103 62 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Horney, Johan, et al Albihn Holmqvist AB, P.O. Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90909781.8 | 15.06.1990 | [1992/15] | WO1990SE00424 | Priority number, date | SE19890002206 | 19.06.1989 Original published format: SE 8902206 | SE19900000805 | 07.03.1990 Original published format: SE 9000805 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015675 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478657 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21C47/24, B65H49/06, B65H67/06 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B65H49/06 (EP);
B21C47/24 (EP);
B65H57/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, ES, FR, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR HANDHABUNG EINES METALLISCHEN VERPACKUNGSDRAHTCOILS ZUM VERPACKEN VON Z.B. PULPENBALLEN | [1992/15] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR HANDLING A COIL OF METAL PACKING WIRE INTENDED FOR PACKING PULP BALES, FOR EXAMPLE | [1992/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET AGENCEMENT DE MANIPULATION D'UNE BOBINE DE CABLE D'EMBALLAGE METALLIQUE DESTINEE A L'EMBALLAGE DE BALLES DE PULPE, PAR EXEMPLE | [1992/15] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/04] | 26.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3082973 ; | [X]FR2582548 ; | [A]US3439882 ; | [A]GB1495681 |