EP0429627 - DERIVATIVES OF QUINOLINE-3-CARBOXANILIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia AB (reg.number 556131-9608) 171 97 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states Pharmacia AB (reg.number 556131-9608) S-171 97 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states Kabi Pharmacia AB Rapsgatan 7 S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states PHARMACIA AB S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNNARSSON, Per, Olov Gartnergatan 4 S-252 51 Helsingborg / SE | 02 /
STALHANDSKE, Torbjörn Brännögatan 13 S-253 72 Helsingborg / SE | 03 /
STRANDGARDEN, Kerstin Blomsterstigen 3 S-260 30 Vallakra / SE | 04 /
LUNDVALL, Karl-Erik Espehögsvägen 69 S-262 00 Ängelholm / SE | 05 /
JOHANSSON, Kaj Rektorsgatan 22 S-252 36 Helsingborg / SE | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/37] |
Former [1991/23] | Thylén, Eva c/o Kabi Pharmacia AB Box 941 S-251 09 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 90909805.5 | 31.05.1990 | [1991/23] | WO1990SE00375 | Priority number, date | SE19890002076 | 09.06.1989 Original published format: SE 8902076 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015052 | Date: | 13.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429627 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0429627 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/56, A61K31/47 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
C07D215/56 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | QUINOLIN-3-CARBOXANILID-DERIVATE | [1991/23] | English: | DERIVATIVES OF QUINOLINE-3-CARBOXANILIDE | [1991/23] | French: | DERIVES DE QUINOLINE-3-CARBOXANILIDE | [1991/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.1991 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 16.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0059698 (LEO AB [SE]); | [A]EP0165474 (BAYER AG [DE]) |