EP0429633 - THERMISTOR AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dale Electronics, Inc. 1122 23rd Street, P.O. Box 609 Columbus Nebraska 68602-6222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states DALE ELECTRONICS, INC. 1122 23rd Street Columbus, NB 68602-0609 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKE, Francis, M. 1450 George Dieter, Apt. 14G El Paso, TX 79936 / US | 02 /
BUCHANAN, William, L. 15327 Werling El Paso, TX 79927 / US | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Chauchard, Robert, et al Cabinet Malemont 42, avenue du Président Wilson 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | Chauchard, Robert, et al c/o Cabinet Malémont 42, avenue du Président Wilson F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90910024.0 | 18.06.1990 | [1991/23] | WO1990US03389 | Priority number, date | US19890368281 | 19.06.1989 Original published format: US 368281 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9016074 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429633 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0429633 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01C17/00, G01C17/06 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
H01C17/02 (EP,US);
H01C7/043 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49083 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49101 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49787 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49789 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49989 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/23] | Title | German: | THERMISTOR UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1991/23] | English: | THERMISTOR AND METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME | [1991/23] | French: | THERMISTOR ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION | [1991/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.1991 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.1991 | Search fee paid | 23.01.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3718197 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [A]EP0308306 (EUROP COMPOSANTS ELECTRON [FR]); | [A]US4148856 (GRESS ROBERT W, et al) | International search | [Y]US4434416 (SCHONBERGER MILTON [US]); | [Y]US4480376 (HAKANSON BO H [SE]); | [Y]US4531110 (JOHNSON JR DAVID W [US], et al); | [Y]US4766409 (MANDAI HARUHUMI [JP]); | [Y]US4786888 (YONEDA YASUNOBU [JP], et al) |