EP0484355 - PROCESS FOR TRANSFERRING PICTORIAL OR GRAPHICAL PATTERNS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TASCHNER, Hans-Joachim Postfach 330 D-86392 Bobingen / DE | [1992/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/20] | Schroeter, Helmut Schroeter & Lehmann Patentanwälte Postfach 71 03 50 D-81453 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90910625.4 | 20.07.1990 | [1992/20] | WO1990EP01205 | Priority number, date | DE19893924848 | 27.07.1989 Original published format: DE 3924848 | [1992/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102296 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484355 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G7/00 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
D06Q1/00 (EP);
B44C1/1729 (EP);
D06Q1/12 (EP);
G03G7/0073 (EP);
G03G7/0093 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BILD- UND/ODER SCHRIFTMUSTERN | [1992/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR TRANSFERRING PICTORIAL OR GRAPHICAL PATTERNS | [1992/20] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE TRANSFERT DE MODELES D'IMAGES ET/OU D'INSCRIPTIONS | [1992/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/36] | 21.04.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.04.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   16.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP119360 ; | [X]US4066802 ; | [X]US4064285 ; | [X]US3716360 ; | [X]EP0040923 | [X] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL. vol. 2, no. 2, April 1977, STAMFORD, CONN US Seite 41 C.F.Clemens: "Colored Xerographic Image transfer Process" siehe das ganze Dokument | [A] - XEROX DISCLOSURE JOURNAL. vol. 5, no. 3, Juni 1980, STAMFORD, CONN US Seite 229 L.R.Sagneri: "Non-contaminating heat seal formulation" siehe das ganze Dokument | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 197 (P-868)(3545) 11 Mai 1989, & JP-A-1 19360 (IZUMIYA K.K) 23 Januar 1989, siehe das ganze Dokument, & JP119360 A 00000000 |