EP0482041 - EAR TAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAISLEY INTERNATIONAL GMBH Werkstrasse 19 D-46395 Bocholt-Lowick / DE | [1992/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEHLS, Reinhard Siedlerstr. 5 D-4290 Bocholt / DE | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield, Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Brooks, Nigel Samuel Hill Hampton East Meon Petersfield Hampshire GU32 1QN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90910663.5 | 05.07.1990 | [1992/18] | WO1990EP01116 | Priority number, date | GB19890015879 | 11.07.1989 Original published format: GB 8915879 | GB19890015880 | 11.07.1989 Original published format: GB 8915880 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9100686 | Date: | 24.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482041 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482041 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
A01K11/004 (EP,US);
A01K11/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1993/27] |
Former [1992/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | OHRMARKE | [1992/18] | English: | EAR TAG | [1992/18] | French: | PLAQUE D'OREILLE | [1992/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.1992 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 12.02.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.12.1992 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   11.01.1993 | 09.12.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.1995 | BE | 11.01.1995 | CH | 11.01.1995 | DK | 11.01.1995 | ES | 11.01.1995 | IT | 11.01.1995 | LI | 11.01.1995 | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
DK | 11.01.1995 | ||
IT | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
DK | 11.01.1995 | ||
IT | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
DK | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 11.01.1995 | |
LI | 11.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | EP0014584 [ ] (STAFFORD RODNEY ARTHUR [IE], et al); | EP0047697 [ ] (ZMOKLY TADEUSZ [FR]); | EP0177201 [ ] (ROCKALL FRANCE SA STE NLE [FR]) |