EP0484364 - HONEYCOMB BODY WITH INTERNAL INFLOW EDGES, IN PARTICULAR CATALYST BODY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 53797 Lohmar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states Emitec Gesellschaft für Emissionstechnologie mbH Hauptstrasse 150 D-53797 Lohmar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUS, Wolfgang Gut Horst D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | 02 /
SWARS, Helmut Riedweg 11 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | 03 /
WIERES, Ludwig Oppelner Strasse 2 D-5063 Overath 1 / DE | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann, et al KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rössler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Frohwitter-Geissler & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, et al Xantener Strasse 12 D-40474 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1992/20] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90910747.6 | 16.07.1990 | [1992/20] | WO1990EP01163 | Priority number, date | DE19890009128U | 27.07.1989 Original published format: DE 8909128 U | [1992/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101807 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484364 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484364 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01D53/36, F01N3/28 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
F01N3/2821 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
F01N3/281 (EP,US);
B01J2219/3221 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32213 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32231 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32248 (EP,US);
B01J2219/32408 (EP,US);
F01N2330/02 (EP,US);
F01N2330/32 (EP,US);
F01N2330/323 (EP,US);
F01N2330/42 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1234 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12368 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | WABENKÖRPER MIT INTERNEN ANSTRÖMKANTEN, INSBESONDERE KATALYSATORKÖRPER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1992/20] | English: | HONEYCOMB BODY WITH INTERNAL INFLOW EDGES, IN PARTICULAR CATALYST BODY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [1992/20] | French: | CORPS EN NID D'ABEILLES, A ARETES INTERNES D'ENTREE, NOTAMMENT SUPPORT DE CATALYSEUR POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [1992/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.1991 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB2001547 [ ] (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR); | EP0186801 [ ] (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]); | EP0152560 [ ]; | EP0244798 [ ] (GRACE W R & CO [US]) | Examination | EP0255798 |