EP0434819 - LIFTING CRAMP, MAINLY FOR RAISING CONCRETE SLABS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARTEON, Marcel 16, rue Cino-del-Duca F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1991/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Viard, Jean Cabinet Madeuf-Viard 56A, Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Viard, Jean Cabinet VIARD 28 bis, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90911293.0 | 13.07.1990 | [1991/27] | WO1990FR00529 | Priority number, date | FR19890008767 | 17.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8908767 | [1991/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101423 | Date: | 07.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434819 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434819 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/14 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
E04G21/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | HEBE- UND AUFRICHTANKER, INSBESONDERE FÜR BETONPLATTEN | [1991/27] | English: | LIFTING CRAMP, MAINLY FOR RAISING CONCRETE SLABS | [1991/27] | French: | ANCRE DE LEVAGE ET DE RELEVAGE NOTAMMENT POUR PANNEAU DE BETON | [1991/27] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | AT183553B [ ] (OESTREICHER FRIEDRICH ING); | DD96095 [ ]; | FR2307164 [ ] (ARTEON MARCEL [FR]); | FR2379672 [ ] (FRICKER FRIMEDA METALL DRAHT [DE]); | DE8536798U [ ]; | EP0211256 [ ] (FRICKER SIEGFRIED) |