EP0436740 - LINEAR EXCAVATION CONTROL APPARATUS IN HYDRAULIC EXCAVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIYA, Yukio K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Osaka Wks 3-1-1, Ueno Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Shigeru K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Osaka Wks 3-1-1, Ueno Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | 03 /
ONODA, Takumi K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Osaka Wks 3-1-1, Ueno Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | 04 /
YOKOYAMA, Toshio K.K. Komatsu Seisakusho Osaka Wks 3-1-1, Ueno Hirakata-shi Osaka 573 / JP | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | ||
Former [1991/29] | Newstead, Michael John Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90911699.8 | 02.08.1990 | [1991/29] | WO1990JP00986 | Priority number, date | JP19890200549 | 02.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20054989 | [1991/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102125 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0436740 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436740 | Date: | 02.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/43, E02F9/20 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
E02F3/437 (EP,US);
E02F3/43 (KR);
E02F9/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/29] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINES HYDRAULISCHEN BAGGERS ZUM LINEAR BAGGERN | [1991/29] | English: | LINEAR EXCAVATION CONTROL APPARATUS IN HYDRAULIC EXCAVATOR | [1991/29] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMANDE D'EXCAVATION LINEAIRE DANS UNE EXCAVATRICE HYDRAULIQUE | [1991/29] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.1991 | Translation filed | 26.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.1991 | Search fee paid | 26.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 07.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.11.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 02.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP243419 ; | [A]JP60112935 ; | [E]EP0389136 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]); | [A]US3472127 (SCHEIDT JAMES E) | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 206 (M-967)[4149], 26th April 1990; & JP-A-2 43 419 (KOMATSU LTD) 14-02-1990, & JP243419 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 268 (M-424)[1991], 25th October 1985; & JP-A-60 112 935 (HITACHI) 19-06-1985, & JP60112935 A 00000000 | International search | [X]JPS55168559U ; | [Y]JPS4730501U ; | [Y]JPS5847833 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH) |