EP0486690 - HEAT-BONDABLE PAPER SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NAKAMURA SEISHISHO CO., LTD. 1215, Ohaza-Tsunoe Yame-shi, Fukuoka 834 / JP | [1992/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Yasurou 545, Ohaza-Kitoin Yame-shi Fukuoka 834 / JP | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90911707.9 | 02.08.1990 | [1992/22] | WO1990JP00992 | Priority number, date | JP19890206038 | 08.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20603889 | [1992/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102120 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486690 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486690 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/04 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
D21H19/74 (EP,US);
D21H27/40 (EP,KR,US);
B32B3/00 (KR);
C09J7/21 (EP,US);
C09J7/35 (EP,US);
D21H19/20 (KR);
D21H27/36 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24455 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24694 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2813 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2878 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2896 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/22] | D21H27/40, D21H27/36, D21H19/74, D21H19/20, D21H19/24, C09J7/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/22] | Title | German: | WÄRMEKLEBBARES PAPIERBLATT | [1992/22] | English: | HEAT-BONDABLE PAPER SHEET | [1992/22] | French: | FEUILLE DE PAPIER THERMOCOLLABLE | [1992/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1992 | Translation filed | 03.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 03.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 03.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58008774 ; | [X]JP61250081 ; | [XP]JP2155971 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 077 (C-159)30 March 1983 & JP-A-58 008 774 ( FUJI SHIROU KK ) 18 January 1983, & JP58008774 A 19830118 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 101 (C-413)31 March 1987 & JP-A-61 250 081 ( SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD ) 7 November 1986, & JP61250081 A 19861107 | [XP] - DATABASE WPIL Section Ch, Week 9030, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A81, AN 90-227975 & JP-A-2 155 971 (OJI KAKO KK) 16 June 1990, & JP2155971 A 19900616 | International search | [A]JPS3615781Y ; | [Y]JPS3814404Y ; | [Y]JPS504029B ; | [X]JPS53119313 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JPS54135221 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON); | [X]JPS5445417Y |