EP0446311 - TURBINE ENGINE WITH PIN INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford Illinois 61125- 7003 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4949 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford Illinois 61125- 7003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEKLETON, Jack, R. 2409 Hartford Street San Diego, CA 92110 / US | 02 /
SACHRISON, Steven, A. 3230 Caminito East Bluff, 74 LaJolla, CA 92037 / US | 03 /
SLEDD, Michael, W. 1018 Cielita Drive Vista, CA 92083 / US | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912058.6 | 27.04.1990 | [1991/38] | WO1990US02401 | Priority number, date | US19890379548 | 13.07.1989 Original published format: US 379548 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9100954 | Date: | 24.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0446311 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446311 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.01.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/28, F23D11/00 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
F23D11/005 (EP,US);
F23R3/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/38] | F02C1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/38] | Title | German: | TURBINENMOTOR MIT NADELINJEKTOR | [1991/38] | English: | TURBINE ENGINE WITH PIN INJECTOR | [1991/38] | French: | MOTEUR A TURBINE A INJECTEUR A POINTEAU | [1991/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1991 | Search fee paid | 06.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2143938 (ROLLS ROYCE); | [A]US3320744 (BLAKELY JAMES M, et al); | [A]EP0159153 (GARRETT CORP [US]); | [A]US2701165 (BETE JOHN U, et al); | [A]US2058823 (PIGOTT REGINALD J S) | International search | [Y]US517310 ; | [Y]US4242863 (BAILEY JOHN M); | [Y]US4275564 (KAPPLER GUENTER, et al); | [X]GB657789 (ROLLS ROYCE) |