EP0438603 - METHOD OF TREATING EXHAUST GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 5-1, Ebisujima-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 5-1, Ebisujima-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIMOTO, Masafumi 2-19, Yachiyodori Sakai-shi Osaka 590 / JP | 02 /
NAKATSUJI, Tadao 10-13, Mamigaoka 1-chome Kashiba-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun Nara 639-02 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Kimihiko 7-4A-608, Miharadai, 2-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-01 / JP | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90912079.2 | 13.08.1990 | [1991/31] | WO1990JP01031 | Priority number, date | JP19890209054 | 11.08.1989 Original published format: JP 20905489 | [1991/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101795 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438603 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.02.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, B01D46/00, F01N3/02, F01N3/10 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
B01D53/9445 (EP,US);
B01D53/9454 (EP,US);
F01N13/0097 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
F01N3/2807 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
F01N2330/12 (EP,US);
F01N2510/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGASEN | [1991/31] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING EXHAUST GAS | [1991/31] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [1991/31] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1991 | Translation filed | 11.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1991 | Search fee paid | 11.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/45] | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63242324 ; | [Y]FR2373675 (UGINE KUHLMANN [FR]); | [Y]EP0089199 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]GB1493398 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]EP0092023 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 42 (C-564)[3390], 30th January 1989, page 153 C 564; & JP-A-63 242 324 (RIKEN CORP.) 07-10-1988, & JP63242324 A 00000000 | International search | JPS5730551 [ ] (NGK SPARK PLUG CO); | JPH01151706 [ ] (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al) |