EP0489762 - INSTALLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORMA GmbH + Co. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states DORMA GmbH + Co. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 D-58256 Ennepetal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREUNDNER, Hasso In den Buchen 9 D-5884 Halver / DE | 02 /
GRABOWSKI, Walter In der Wüste 14 D-5960 Olpe-Biggesee / DE | [1992/25] | Application number, filing date | 90912105.5 | 24.08.1990 | [1992/25] | WO1990DE00650 | Priority number, date | DE19893928519 | 29.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3928519 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103851 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489762 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489762 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/16 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
H02G3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | INSTALLATIONSSYSTEM | [1992/25] | English: | INSTALLATION SYSTEM | [1992/25] | French: | SYSTEME D'INSTALLATION | [1992/25] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.05.1991 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1994/24] | FR | 29.10.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2341232 (FRANZ & RUTENBECK); | [A]US3922478 (PERKEY PRESTON R); | [A]DE3004950 (GRABOWSKI WALTER); | [A]DE3431836 (THIENEL BERNHARD); | [XP]DE3834289 (GRABOWSKI WALTER [DE]) |