EP0489043 - USE OF THE (+)-ENANTIOMER OF ANIPAMIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states KNOLL AG Postfach 21 08 05 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Claus, D. Im Schaflaeger 30 D-6806 Viernheim / DE | 02 /
GRIES, Josef Roemerweg 43 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Karau, Wolfgang, et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | Karau, Wolfgang, Dr., et al BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung ZDX - C 6 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90912145.1 | 22.08.1990 | [1992/24] | WO1990EP01398 | Priority number, date | DE19893928287 | 26.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3928287 | [1992/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102524 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489043 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489043 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/275 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/275 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/24] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG DES (+)-ENANTIOMEREN VON ANIPAMIL | [1992/24] | English: | USE OF THE (+)-ENANTIOMER OF ANIPAMIL | [1992/24] | French: | UTILISATION DE L'ENANTIOMERE(+) DE L'ANIPAMIL | [1992/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1991 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0276369 [ ] (KNOLL AG [DE]); | EP0270782 [ ] (BASF AG [DE]) |