EP0438567 - PREPARATION OF D-MALIC ACID OR DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1991/31] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUMEN, Kurt, Eckhard c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650 / US | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90912153.5 | 13.08.1990 | [1991/31] | WO1990US04527 | Priority number, date | US19890395003 | 17.08.1989 Original published format: US 395003 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102808 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438567 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12P41/00, C12P7/46 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
C12P41/001 (EP,US);
Y10S435/822 (EP,US);
Y10S435/874 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/31] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON D-MALEINSÄURE ODER -DERIVAT | [1991/31] | English: | PREPARATION OF D-MALIC ACID OR DERIVATIVE | [1991/31] | French: | PREPARATION DE L'ACIDE D-MALIQUE OU DE SES DERIVES | [1991/31] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/02] | 16.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3063910 (SHIGEO ABE, et al); | [A]US4204044 (FUJIU MORIO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0043211 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, volume 91, no. 11, 10 September 1979, (Columbus, Ohio, US), Haferburg,D et al : "Uptake of organic acids by Acinetobacter alcoaceticus ", see page 395, abstract 87071z, & Z.Allg.Mikrobiol. 1979, 19( 5), 319- 32 |