EP0439584 - CHILLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELL, Allan John 12 Leigh Street Werribee, VIC 3030 / AU | [1991/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912230.1 | 22.08.1990 | [1991/32] | WO1990AU00362 | Priority number, date | AU19890005878 | 22.08.1989 Original published format: AU 587889 | AU19890007872 | 14.12.1989 Original published format: AU 787289 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102933 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439584 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439584 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/02, F25D3/00 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
F25D17/02 (EP,US);
F25D31/007 (EP);
F25D2331/803 (EP,US);
F25D2400/10 (EP,US);
F25D2400/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | ABKÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [1991/32] | English: | CHILLING APPARATUS | [1991/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [1991/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1991 | Search fee paid | 17.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 28.09.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 31.05.1994 | Date of receipt | 09.11.1995 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.02.1993 | 31.08.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.05.1994 | 31.08.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.1995 | 31.08.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1710830 (LOWDER JOHN W); | [A]GB314173 (NAAMLOOZE VENNOOTSCHAP THE KOD, et al); | [A]FR718178 ; | [A]US1982570 (CANN HARRY E); | [A]DE646207 (BOSCH ROBERT AG); | [A]US2418300 (HAGSTROM JEROME E); | [Y]DE2349539 (MK REFRIGERATION LTD); | [A]US3888092 (FISHER JAMES I); | [A]DE2428361 (BENTELER WERKE AG); | [Y]EP0191436 (SIPP SPA [IT]) | International search | US2470551 [ ] (FISH MORTIMER W); | AU3481868 [ ]; | AU4715585 [ ] (CASTLETON INC); | AU4187189 [ ] (MULTICHIL PTY LTD) |