EP0437583 - PROCESS FOR IMPARTING STAIN-RESIST AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FITZGERALD, Patrick, Henry 640 Howard Avenue Pitman, NJ 08071 / US | 02 /
MATERNIAK, Joyce, Monson 117 Cheltenham Road Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 03 /
MOORES, Mead, Stephen 2704 Tanager Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | 04 /
OPENSTONE, Ella, Daniel 1002 Trenton Place Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | 05 /
RIVET, Ernest 5 Halsey Drive Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912256.6 | 11.07.1990 | [1991/30] | WO1990US03798 | Priority number, date | US19890389894 | 04.08.1989 Original published format: US 389894 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102116 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437583 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437583 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/263, D06M15/41, D06M13/256 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
D06M15/412 (EP,US);
D06M15/263 (EP,US);
D06M2101/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON SCHMUTZABWEISENDEN MITTELN | [1995/08] | English: | PROCESS FOR IMPARTING STAIN-RESIST AGENTS | [1991/30] | French: | PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'AGENTS RESISTANT AUX TACHES | [1991/30] |
Former [1991/30] | VERFAHREN ZUM MITTEILEN VON FLECKENWIDERSTAND | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.1995 | CH | 22.02.1995 | DK | 22.02.1995 | ES | 22.02.1995 | IT | 22.02.1995 | LI | 22.02.1995 | SE | 22.05.1995 | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 22.02.1995 | |
CH | 22.02.1995 | ||
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
LI | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
LU | 31.07.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 22.02.1995 | |
CH | 22.02.1995 | ||
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
LI | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 22.02.1995 | |
CH | 22.02.1995 | ||
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
LI | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 22.02.1995 | |
CH | 22.02.1995 | ||
LI | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 22.02.1995 | |
CH | 22.02.1995 | ||
LI | 22.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | CH | 22.02.1995 | |
LI | 22.02.1995 | Cited in | International search | US3835071 [ ] (ALLEN W, et al); | US4822373 [ ] (OLSON MAYNARD H [US], et al); | EP0322995 [ ] (CROMPTON & KNOWLES CORP [US]) |