EP0538256 - TRAP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RYDBERG, Sverker Svänggatan 10 595 35 Mjölby / SE | [1996/48] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states RYDBERG, Sverker Nackebo Gard S-590 20 Mantorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/17] | Representative(s) | Engström, Christer Smultronvägen 61 331 42 Värnamo / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Engström, Christer Smultronvägen 61 S-331 00 Värnamo / SE | Application number, filing date | 90912295.4 | 02.07.1990 | [1993/17] | WO1990SE00472 | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200008 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0538256 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0538256 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A01M23/24 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
A01M23/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/17] | Title | German: | FALLE | [1993/17] | English: | TRAP | [1993/17] | French: | PIEGE | [1993/17] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1993 | Translation filed | 29.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 05.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 02.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Request for further processing for: | 26.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.10.1996 | Decision despatched | 24.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 11.12.1995 | Decision despatched | 02.12.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 12.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.1993 | 31.07.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1994 | 31.07.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1995 | 31.07.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1996 | 31.07.1996 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.1997 | BE | 23.04.1997 | CH | 23.04.1997 | DK | 23.04.1997 | ES | 23.04.1997 | FR | 23.04.1997 | IT | 23.04.1997 | LI | 23.04.1997 | NL | 23.04.1997 | DE | 24.07.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
CH | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
ES | 23.04.1997 | ||
FR | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
LI | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
CH | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
ES | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
LI | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
CH | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
IT | 23.04.1997 | ||
LI | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
CH | 23.04.1997 | ||
DK | 23.04.1997 | ||
LI | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
CH | 23.04.1997 | ||
LI | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
SE | 23.07.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
BE | 23.04.1997 | ||
CH | 23.04.1997 | ||
LI | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
CH | 23.04.1997 | ||
LI | 23.04.1997 | ||
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 23.04.1997 | |
NL | 23.04.1997 | ||
DE | 24.07.1997 | ||
FR | 19.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 23.04.1997 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE2935747 ; | [A]US4122625 (OHTSUKA TOMOAKI); | [A]SE438772 (RYDBERG SVERKER) |