EP0486574 - IMPROVED SEWAGE TREATMENT PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | ||
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Division of Radiophysics, 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRIESTLEY, Anthony, John 86 Shoubra Road Elsternwick, VIC 3185 / AU | 02 /
SUDARMANA, David, Louis 1 Vogue Avenue Vermont South, VIC 3133 / AU | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Monica Anne J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Marshall, Monica Anne J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912352.3 | 15.08.1990 | [1992/22] | WO1990AU00348 | Priority number, date | AU19890005808 | 16.08.1989 Original published format: AU 580889 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102698 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486574 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486574 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/28, C02F1/48, C02F1/52, C02F1/24, C02F9/00 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
C02F1/5236 (EP);
C02F1/281 (EP);
C02F1/488 (EP);
C02F9/00 (EP);
C02F1/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/22] | C02F1/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/22] | Title | German: | KLÄRVERFAHREN | [1992/22] | English: | IMPROVED SEWAGE TREATMENT PROCESS | [1992/22] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE TRAITEMENT DES EAUX D'EGOUT | [1992/22] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1992 | Search fee paid | 02.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.02.1994 | DK | 23.02.1994 | ES | 23.02.1994 | IT | 23.02.1994 | LI | 23.02.1994 | SE | 23.02.1994 | LU | 31.08.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | CH | 23.02.1994 | |
DK | 23.02.1994 | ||
IT | 23.02.1994 | ||
LI | 23.02.1994 | ||
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
LU | 31.08.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 23.02.1994 | |
DK | 23.02.1994 | ||
IT | 23.02.1994 | ||
LI | 23.02.1994 | ||
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | CH | 23.02.1994 | |
DK | 23.02.1994 | ||
LI | 23.02.1994 | ||
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | CH | 23.02.1994 | |
LI | 23.02.1994 | ||
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 23.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4427550 (PRIESTLEY ANTHONY J [AU]); | [A]LU45272 | International search | [Y]US4279756 (WEISS DONALD E, et al); | [Y]US3268443 (CANN EVERETT D); | [A]AU7970087 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG); | [A]AU554857B (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG) |