EP0489056 - IGNITION DISTRIBUTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 70327 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states DODUCO GMBH + Co Dr. Eugen Dürrwächter Im Altgefäll 12 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states DODUCO GMBH + Co Dr. Eugen Dürrwächter Im Altgefäll 12 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | |||
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states DODUCO GMBH + Co Dr. Eugen Dürrwächter Im Altgefäll 12 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEHNKE, Horst Thymianweg 7 D-7300 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
MICHAL, Roland Krähenstrasse 8 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | 03 /
BAHM, Klaus Schweizstrasse 20 D-7527 Kraichtal 4 / DE | [1994/41] |
Former [1992/24] | 01 /
BEHNKE, Horst Thymianweg 7 D-7300 Esslingen / DE | ||
02 /
MICHAL, Roland Krähenstra e 8 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | |||
03 /
BAHM, Klaus Schweizstra e 20 D-7527 Kraichtal 4 / DE | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 90912410.9 | 22.08.1990 | [1992/24] | WO1990EP01395 | Priority number, date | DE19890010037U | 22.08.1989 Original published format: DE 8910037 U | [1992/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102899 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489056 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489056 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02P7/02 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
F02P7/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, SE [1994/41] |
Former [1992/24] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | ZÜNDVERTEILER FÜR VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINEN | [1992/24] | English: | IGNITION DISTRIBUTOR FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [1992/24] | French: | ALLUMEUR POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1992/24] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/50: Verbunden mit 90116072.1/0414217 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 28.10.93 | EPB 1993/50: Consolidated with 90116072.1/0414217 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 28.10.93 | EPB 1993/50: Jointe à la demande no. 90116072.1/0414217 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 28.10.93 | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 12.10.1994 | FR | 12.10.1994 | GB | 12.10.1994 | GR | 12.10.1994 | IT | 12.10.1994 | SE | 12.01.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 12.10.1994 | |
GB | 12.10.1994 | ||
GR | 12.10.1994 | ||
IT | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | GB | 12.10.1994 | |
GR | 12.10.1994 | ||
IT | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 12.10.1994 | |
IT | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/37] | GB | 12.10.1994 | |
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | SE | 12.01.1995 | |
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | SE | 12.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | DE3837808 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | FR502536 [ ] (SCINTILLA SOC [CH]); | US3542976 [ ] (MORAY FOREST J); | FR525168 [ ] (CHARLES LOW ATKINSON [US]); | FR2039754 [ ] (WEBSTER MILLARD); | FR2133120 [ ] (DUCELLIER & CIE); | DE3136745 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | Examination | DE3743940 |