EP0489771 - MODIFIED HUMAN ANTI-Rh(D) ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Blood Authority Oak House, Reeds Crescent Watford, Herts. WD1 1QH / GB | [1993/47] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states Central Blood Laboratories Authority "The Crest", Dagger Lane, Elstree Boreham Wood, Hertfordshire, WD6 3AU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCOTT, Marion, Lesley Flat 16 5 Royal York Crescent Clifton Bristol BS8 4JW / GB | 02 /
GUEST, Alan, Robert 5 Chequers Court Palmers Leaze Bradley Stoke South Bristol BS12 0HD / GB | 03 /
ANSTEE, David, John 1 Cavendish Road Henleaze Bristol BS9 4DZ / GB | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90912594.0 | 31.08.1990 | [1992/25] | WO1990EP01463 | Priority number, date | GB19890019761 | 01.09.1989 Original published format: GB 8919761 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103492 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489771 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489771 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/28, G01N33/80, A61K39/395 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
C07K16/34 (EP);
G01N33/80 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE MENSCHLICHE ANTI-RH(D)-ANTIKÖRPER | [1992/25] | English: | MODIFIED HUMAN ANTI-Rh(D) ANTIBODIES | [1992/25] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-Rh(D) HUMAINS MODIFIES | [1992/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 05.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0022669 (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]GB2066259 (GAMMA BIOLOGICALS INC); | [Y]WO8902600 (CENTRAL BLOOD LAB AUTHORITY [GB]); | [A]WO8902443 (CENTRAL BLOOD LAB AUTHORITY [GB]) | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., Vol. 74, No. 6, June 1977 D G Romans et al.: "Conversion of incomplete antibodies to direct agglutinins by mild reduction: Evidence for segmental flexibility within the Fc fragment of immunoglobulin G ", | [A] - TRANSFUSION, Vol. 27, 1987 E C Jones et al.: "False-positive results with chemically modified anti-D ", | [Y] - Immunology, Vol. 67, August 1989 A G Hadley et al.: "Synergistic effect of blending IgG1 and IgG3 monoclonal anti-D in promoting the metabolic response of monocytes to sensitized red cells ", | [A] - Immunology, Vol. 62, November 1987 E. Wiener et al.: "Differences between the activities of human monoclonal IgG1 and IgG3 subclasses of anti-D(Rh) antibody in their ability to mediate red cell-binding to macrophages ", | [A] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Vol. 81, May 1984 Dominique Bron et al.: "Production of human monoclonal IgG antibodies against Rhesus (D) antigen ", | [A] - Immunology, Vol. 58, 1986 K M Thompson et al.: "Production of human monoclonal IgG and IgM antibodies with anti-D (rhesus) specificity using heterohybridomas ", | Examination | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., vol. 74, no. 6, June 1977, D.G. Romans et al., pp.2531-2535 | - Transfusion, vol. 27, 1987, E.C. Jones et al., pp. 142-144 | - Immunology, vol. 67, August 1989, A.G. Hadley et al., pp. 550-552 | - Immunology, vol. 62, Nov. 1987, E. Wiener et al., pp. 401-404 | - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, vol. 81, May 1984, D. Bron et al., pp. 3214-3217 | - Immunology, vol. 58, 1986, K.M. Thompson et al., pp. 157-160 |