EP0436716 - HYDROSTATIC DRIVE FOR VEHICLES WITH MULTI-AXLE CONTROL, PROCESS FOR DRIVING SAID VEHICLES AND OTHER COMPONENTS HYDROSTATICALLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp Altendorfer Strasse 103 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states Fried. Krupp AG Hoesch-Krupp Altendorfer Strasse 103 D-45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states KRUPP INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH Franz-Schubert-Strasse 1-3 D-47226 Duisburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASPAR, Ernst Danziger Strasse 29 D-7932 Munderkingen / DE | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Palgen, Peter, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Palgen, Peter, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1993/51] | Palgen, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Dr. P. Palgen und Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Schumacher Frühlingstrasse 43 A D-45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1991/29] | Palgen, Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Peter Palgen, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. H. Schumacher, Mulvanystrasse 2 D-40239 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90912981.9 | 02.08.1990 | [1991/29] | WO1990EP01272 | Priority number, date | DE19893925703 | 03.08.1989 Original published format: DE 3925703 | [1991/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9101899 | Date: | 21.02.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0436716 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436716 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/356, B60K17/10 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
F16H47/04 (EP);
B60K17/10 (EP);
B60K17/356 (EP);
F16H2047/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/29] | Title | German: | HYDROSTATISCHER ANTRIEB FÜR MEHRACHSIG ANGETRIEBENE FAHRZEUGE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM HYDROSTATISCHEN ANTREIBEN DERARTIGER FAHRZEUGE UND ANDERER BAUEINHEITEN | [1991/29] | English: | HYDROSTATIC DRIVE FOR VEHICLES WITH MULTI-AXLE CONTROL, PROCESS FOR DRIVING SAID VEHICLES AND OTHER COMPONENTS HYDROSTATICALLY | [1991/29] | French: | TRANSMISSION HYDROSTATIQUE POUR VEHICULES A PLUSIEURS PONTS MOTEURS, AINSI QUE PROCEDE POUR L'ENTRAINEMENT HYDROSTATIQUE DESDITS VEHICULES ET D'AUTRES COMPOSANTS | [1991/29] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/19: Teilanmeldung 93107003.1 eingereicht am 02/08/90 | EPB 1994/19: Divisional application 93107003.1 filed on 02/08/90 | EPB 1994/19: Demande divisionnaire 93107003.1 déposée le 02/08/90 | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 21.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93108941.1 / EP0561430 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1680157 (LINDE AG); | [A]GB2119905 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | [A]DE3331651 (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG); | [A]DE3409566 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]); | [AP]EP0347804 (GOLDHOFER FAHRZEUGWERK [DE]) |