EP0489083 - SMELTING OF METALLURGICAL WASTE MATERIALS CONTAINING IRON COMPOUNDS AND TOXIC ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUSMELT LIMITED 12 Kitchen Road Dandenong, VIC 3175 / AU | [1995/50] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states AUSMELT PTY. LTD. 2/13 Kitchen Road, P.O. Box 1003 Dandenong, Victoria 3175 / AU | ||
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states AUSMELT PTY. LTD. 304 High Street Kew, VIC 3101 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDOCK, Brian Ross 49 McCormicks Road Skye, VIC 3977 / AU | 02 /
FLOYD, John Millice 70-72 Emerald Road Upper Beaconsfield, VIC 3808 / AU | 03 /
LIGHTFOOT, Brian William Lot 19, Messmate Crescent Emerald, VIC 3782 / AU | 04 /
ROBILLIARD, Kenneth Roland 9 Leonard Street Upwey, VIC 3158 / AU | [1994/46] |
Former [1992/24] | 01 /
BALDOCK, Brian, Ross 49 McCormicks Road Skye, VIC 3977 / AU | ||
02 /
FLOYD, John, Millice 70-72 Emerald Road Upper Beaconsfield, VIC 3808 / AU | |||
03 /
LIGHTFOOT, Brian, William Lot 19, Messmate Crescent Emerald, VIC 3782 / AU | |||
04 /
ROBILLIARD, Kenneth, Roland 9 Leonard Street Upwey, VIC 3158 / AU | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90913040.3 | 23.08.1990 | [1992/24] | WO1990AU00365 | Priority number, date | AU1989PJ05948 | 24.08.1989 Original published format: AU PJ594889 | [1996/29] |
Former [1992/24] | AU19890005948 | 24.08.1989 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102824 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489083 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489083 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 07.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C22B7/00, C22B7/04, C22B5/10, C22B5/12, C22B5/16, C22B7/02, // C22B11/02, C22B13/02, C22B19/20, C22B30/04 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
F23G5/085 (EP,US);
C22B5/10 (EP,US);
C22B5/12 (EP,US);
C22B7/02 (EP,US);
C22B7/04 (EP,US);
F23G2202/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/24] | C22B7/00, C22B7/04, C22B5/10, C22B5/12, // C22B11/02, C22B13/02, C22B19/20, C22B30/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1996/20] |
Former [1995/02] | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE | ||
Former [1992/48] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | ||
Former [1992/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERHÜTTUNG METALLURGISCHER ABFALLSTOFFE ENTHALTEND EISENBESTANDTEILE UND TOXISCHE ELEMENTE | [1992/24] | English: | SMELTING OF METALLURGICAL WASTE MATERIALS CONTAINING IRON COMPOUNDS AND TOXIC ELEMENTS | [1992/24] | French: | TRAITEMENT PAR FUSION DE DECHETS METALLURGIQUES CONTENANT DES COMPOSES DE FER ET DES ELEMENTS TOXIQUES | [1992/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 14.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 24.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 25.03.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GB, LU, SE | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.04.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.1992 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.1993 | 01.09.1994 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.09.1994 | 01.09.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AU6970787B (AUSMELT PROPRIETARY LIMITED) [Y] 1-5,7-9,13-17,20 * page 4, lines 19-22; page 5, lines 4-9; example 1; claims *; | [A]AU6152786D ; | [A]JPS5831046 ; | [Y]WO8703010 (AUSMELT PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-5,7-9,13-17,20 * page 3, lines 19-28; example; claims *; | [A]US4741770 (ANDREWS BARRY S [AU], et al); | [A]EP0328677 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * figures 1,2; claim - *; | [E]WO9202648 (MOUNT ISA MINES [AU]) [E] 1 * claim - * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 12, Database accession no. 87-079881, & AU6152786D D 19870219 (PYROTECH RESOURCES & AUSMELT PTY LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830511), vol. 7, no. 108, Database accession no. (C - 165), & JP58031046 A 19830223 (NIHON KOGYO SHINKOUKAI) [A] * abstract * | International search | [A]AU2849477 (METALLURGIE HOBOKEN); | [A]WO8102568 (BOLIDEN AB [SE], et al); | [A]AU6465380 (ANCHOR DARLING VALVE CO); | [A]AU9006082 (SKF STEEL ENG AB); | [A]AU4192985 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG, et al) | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Week 8429, issued 29 August 1984, (DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD.), Section Ch: Chemical, METALLURGY, page 11, 'SU A1 1054436', UST-KAMENGORSKIJ REVOLYUTSII SVINTSOVOTSINKOVYJ KOMBINATIM.V.I.LENINA 15 November 1983 (15.11.83), (see the whole Abstract). |