EP0490956 - OPTICAL MEASURING INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1994/45] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP PLC 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states Downs, Michael John 37 Shepherds Way Liphook Hampshire GU30 7HF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Downs, Michael John 37 Shepherds Way Liphook, Hampshire GU30 7HF / GB | [1994/46] |
Former [1992/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Cullis, Roger Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Cullis, Roger Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90913514.7 | 07.09.1990 | [1992/26] | WO1990GB01394 | Priority number, date | GB19890020364 | 08.09.1989 Original published format: GB 8920364 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103702 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490956 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490956 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
G01B9/02059 (EP,US);
G01B9/02058 (EP,US);
G01B9/02061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/26] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE MESSINSTRUMENTE | [1992/26] | English: | OPTICAL MEASURING INSTRUMENTS | [1992/26] | French: | INSTRUMENTS DE MESURE OPTIQUES | [1992/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB717233 [ ] (FRANCIS HUGHES SMITH, et al); | GB800304 [ ] (NAT RES DEV); | DE1772171 [ ] (OPTOMECHANISMS INC); | US4265540 [ ] (DOYLE WALTER M); | US4278351 [ ] (BRECKINRIDGE JAMES B [US], et al); | US4286877 [ ] (CLARKE WILLIAM L); | GB2117918 [ ] (SUHL FEINMESSZEUGFAB VEB) | [ ] - Optica Acta, Volume 9, No. 2, April 1962, W.H. STEEL: "Adjustable Compensators for Two-Beam Interferometers", page 111-119 see pages 113-118 | [ ] - NASA Tech. Briefs, Volume 4, no. 1, 1979 J.B. BRECKINRIDGE: "A Chevron Beam-Splitter Interferometers", pages 51-52 see the whole article | Examination | US4565540 |