EP0489836 - LIGHT ACTIVATED ACYL-ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University Erwin Road, Raleigh Durham North Carolina 27706 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states DUKE UNIVERSITY Erwin Road, Raleigh Durham, North Carolina 27706 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORTER, Ned, A. 3301 West Cornwallis Road Durham, NC 27705 / US | 02 /
BRUHNKE, John, D. 931 Lambeth Circle Durham, NC 27705 / US | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Horner, Martin Grenville Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | Horner, Martin Grenville Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 90913585.7 | 27.08.1990 | [1992/25] | WO1990US04872 | Priority number, date | US19890400507 | 29.08.1989 Original published format: US 400507 | [1992/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103549 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489836 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489836 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N13/00, C12N9/68, C12N9/70, C12N9/74, C12N9/76, C07C205/43, C07C205/56, C07C229/44, C07C257/18 | [1994/51] | CPC: |
C12N9/6429 (EP,US);
C07C205/43 (EP,US);
C07C205/56 (EP,US);
C07C229/44 (EP,US);
C07C257/18 (EP,US);
C12N13/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/50 (EP,US);
C12Y304/21005 (EP,US);
C12N9/52 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/25] | C12N13/00, C12N9/68, C12N9/70, C12N9/74, C12N9/76, C07D211/56, C07D211/26, C07D211/98, C07D211/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/25] | Title | German: | LICHTAKTIVIERTE ACYLENZYME | [1992/25] | English: | LIGHT ACTIVATED ACYL-ENZYMES | [1992/25] | French: | ENZYMES-ACYLS ACTIVES PAR LA LUMIERE | [1992/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 21.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 31.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS vol. 40, no. 8, August 1987, TOKYO JP pages 1209 - 1210 ISSHIKI,KUNIO ET AL 'Inhibition of Tyrosine protein kinase by synthetic erbstatin analogs.' | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, no. 13, 28 March 1988, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 108716a, AISINA, R.B. ET AL. 'Synthesis and kinetics of deacylation of some human acylplasmins.' page 288 ; | [XP] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. vol. 111, no. 19, 13 September 1989, GASTON, PA US pages 7616 - 7618 NED A. PORTER ET AL. 'Acyl Thrombin Photochemistry:Kinetics for deacylation of enzyme cinnamate geometric isomers.' | [XP] - BIOCHEMISTRY. vol. 29, no. 20, 1990, EASTON, PA US pages 4871 - 4879 BARRY L: STODDARD ET AL. 'Structure and activity of two photoreversible cinnamates bound to Chymotrypsin.' | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 112, no. 15, 9 April 1990, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 136511f, PORTER NED A. ET AL. 'Photocoagulation of human plasma: Acyl serine proteinase photochemistry.' page 482 ; | International search | [Y] - J. Am. Chem, Soc., Vol. 110, No.1, issued 1988, TURNER et al., "Photoreactivation of Irreversibly Inhibited Serine Proteinases", pages 244-250, see especially pages 244-245. | [Y] - J. Am. Chem. Soc., Vol. 109, issued 1987, TURNER et al., "Photochemical Activation of Acylated alpha-Thrombin", pages 1274-1275, see entire document. | [Y] - Febs Letters, Vol. 15, No.2, issued June 1971, VARTOLOMEYEV et al., "Light Initiated Enzymic Activity Caused by Photostereo Isomerization of Cis-4-Nitrocinnamoyl-alpha-chymotrypsin", pages 118-120, see entire document. | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 78, No. 19, BHAT et al., "Chemotherapy of Fungus Infections. III. Alkyl or aryl thiosemicarbazones, acid hydrazones, and styrl, aryl ketones of 5-bromo-and 5-nitrosalicyclaldehydes". Column 1, Abstract No. 119650n, Indian J. Chem., 10(7), 694-8. | Examination | - Febs Letters, vol. 15, no. 2, iss. June 1971, Vartolomeyer et al., pp. 118-120 | - Chem. Abstracts, vol. 78, no. 19, Bhat et al., abstract no. 119650n; Indian J. Chem. 10(7), 694-8 |