EP0445298 - COLOR CATHODE-RAY TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | For all designated states MIYOTA CO., LTD. 4107-5, Aza-Obayashi, Oaza-Miyota, Miyota-machi KITA-SAKU-GUN NAGANO 389-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
For all designated states MIYOTA CO., LTD. 4107-5, Aza-Obayashi, Oaza-Miyota, Miyota-machi KITA-SAKU-GUN, NAGANO 389-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSAKA, Norihisa, c/o Products Development Labs. Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd, 1-60, Sunadabashi 4-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461 / JP | 02 /
IKEGAMI, Yukihiro, c/o Products Development Labs. Mitsubishi Rayon Co.Ltd, 1-60, Sunadabashi 4-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi, Aichi 461 / JP | [1992/13] |
Former [1991/37] | 01 /
OSAKA, Norihisa Products Development Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd 1-60, Sunadabashi 4-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 46 / JP | ||
02 /
IKEGAMI, Y. Products Development Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 1-60, Sunadabashi4-chome Higashi-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 461 / JP | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90913735.8 | 21.09.1990 | [1991/37] | WO1990JP01218 | Priority number, date | JP19890111482U | 22.09.1989 Original published format: JP 11148289 U | JP19890269388 | 17.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26938889 | [1991/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9104568 | Date: | 04.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445298 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/227, H01J29/32, H01J31/20 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
H01J29/325 (EP);
H01J9/227 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [1991/37] | H01J9/227, H01J29/34, H01J31/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/37] | Title | German: | FARBKATHODENRÖHRE | [1991/37] | English: | COLOR CATHODE-RAY TUBE | [1991/37] | French: | TUBE CATHODIQUE COULEUR | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.1991 | Translation filed | 22.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1991 | Search fee paid | 22.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/27] | 31.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP1265426 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 28 (E-875)(3971) 19 January 1990 & JP-A-1 265 426 ( MITSUBISHI RAYON ) 23 October 1989, & JP1265426 A 19891023 | International search | [A]JPS5431270 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS5092751 ; | [A]JPS4410298B ; | [A]JPS5533585B |