EP0490979 - PHYSIOLOGIC LOW STRESS ANGIOPLASTY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION One Boston Scientific Place Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US | [1995/30] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION 480 Pleasant Street Watertown, MA 02172-2407 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABELE, John, E. 101 Fairhaven Hill Concord, MA 01742 / US | 02 /
LENNOX, Charles, D. 523 Foxhollow Drive Hudson, New Hampshire 03051 / US | [1992/32] |
Former [1992/26] | 01 /
ABELE, John, E. 101 Fairhaven Hill Concord, MA 01742 / US | ||
02 /
LENNOX, Charles, D. 75 Ledgewood Hills Drive Nashua, NH 02062 / US | Representative(s) | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Deans, Michael John Percy, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90914005.5 | 07.09.1990 | [1992/26] | WO1990US05070 | Priority number, date | US19890404483 | 08.09.1989 Original published format: US 404483 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9103207 | Date: | 21.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490979 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490979 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/38, A61M29/02 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
A61B17/22 (EP,US);
A61B18/08 (EP,US);
A61B18/082 (EP,US);
A61M25/10184 (EP,US);
A61M25/10185 (US);
A61M25/104 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00088 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00132 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00274 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00482 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22002 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22062 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00547 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00559 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/044 (EP,US);
A61B2090/063 (EP,US);
A61B2090/064 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0002 (EP,US);
A61M25/10186 (EP,US);
A61M25/10188 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/26] | A61B17/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | ANGIOPLASTIE MIT NIEDRIGEM PHYSIOLOGISCHEN STRESS | [1992/26] | English: | PHYSIOLOGIC LOW STRESS ANGIOPLASTY | [1992/26] | French: | ANGIOPLASTIE A FAIBLE CONTRAINTE PHYSIOLOGIQUE | [1992/26] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.1992 | Search fee paid | 10.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 13.02.1997 | [1997/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4754752 (GINSBURG ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]EP0205851 ; | [A]EP0315982 (SOLZBACH ULRICH DR [DE], et al); | [A]WO8905609 (ZEIHER ANDREAS [DE]); | [A]US4411648 (DAVIS CHARLES P [US], et al); | [A]WO8905165 (DEVICES VASCULAR INTERVENTION [US]); | [AP]WO9004365 (LENNOX CHARLES D [US], et al) | International search | [X]EP0182689 (MEDICAL LASER RES & DEV CORP [US]); | [Y]US4709698 (JOHNSTON JAMES H [US], et al); | [Y]US4651738 (DEMER LINDA L [US], et al); | [Y]US612724 | [Y] - Percutaneous Transluminal Angioplasty, pgs. 60-72 ZOLLIKOFER, "Results of ... Dilation" 1983 (see fig. 6). | [Y] - AJP, ABELE, "Balloon Catheters and Transluminal Dilatation" April 1980 (see fig. 10). |