EP0496798 - METHOD OF MAKING ARTIFICIAL FOLIAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSMENT MODELS, INC. 1 Main Street Linn Creek, MO 65052 / US | [1992/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSMENT, David L. Lake Road 5456, Alona Point Osage Beach, MO 65065 / US | 02 /
FULTON, C. Dwayne Lake Road 5456 Osage Beach, MO 65065 / US | [1993/16] |
Former [1992/32] | 01 /
OSMENT, David, L. Lake Road 5456 Alona Point Osage Beach, MO 65065 / US | ||
02 /
FULTON, C., Dwayne Lake Road 5456 Osage Beach, MO 64065 / US | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90915906.3 | 17.10.1990 | [1992/32] | WO1990US05960 | Priority number, date | US19890425057 | 20.10.1989 Original published format: US 425057 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9105487 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0496798 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0496798 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A41G1/00, B32B27/40, B44F7/00 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
B44F9/00 (EP,US);
A41G1/00 (EP,US);
A41G1/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/15] |
Former [1992/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KÜNSTLICHEN BLÄTTERN | [1992/32] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING ARTIFICIAL FOLIAGE | [1992/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE FEUILLAGES ARTIFICIELS | [1992/32] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.1992 | Search fee paid | 08.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 21.05.1992 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.05.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]US4950509 (DEMOTT DONALD T [US]) | International search | [A]US1949063 (MERRILL ALLAN B); | [A]US2811906 (CHAPPELL CLIFFORD P); | [A]US2977864 (PULLAR HAROLD B); | [A]US2978351 (PULLAR HAROLD B); | [A]US3554848 (DOCK MORTIMER R); | [Y]US4082586 (OSMENT DAVID L); | [Y]US4202922 (OSMENT DAVID L [US]); | [Y]US4278481 (OSMENT DAVID L) |