EP0452450 - ANALOGUE TO DIGITAL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/50] | For all designated states PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LIMITED Cheney Manor Swindon, Wiltshire SN2 2QW / GB | ||
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESLIE, Thomas Coutts 70 Willow View Kislingbury, Northampton NN7 4AU / GB | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Nicholson, Ronald, et al The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Nicholson, Ronald, et al The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1991/43] | Hoste, Colin Francis The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90916146.5 | 02.11.1990 | [1991/43] | WO1990GB01686 | Priority number, date | GB19890025027 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: GB 8925027 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9107017 | Date: | 16.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452450 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10, H03M1/20 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
H03M3/388 (EP);
H03M3/424 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1991/43] | Title | German: | ANALOG-DIGITALWANDLER | [1991/43] | English: | ANALOGUE TO DIGITAL CONVERTER | [1991/43] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE/NUMERIQUE | [1991/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 01.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/48] | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0189291 [ ]; | WO8605048 [ ]; | GB2022347 [ ] |