EP0460127 - HAIR TONING AGENT IN FOAM FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 D-64295 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAUSEN, Thomas Ernst-Pasqué-Stra e 35 A D-6146 Alsbach / DE | 02 /
HOFFMANN, Axel An der Lettkaute 16 D-6107 Reinheim 1 / DE | [1991/50] | Application number, filing date | 90916193.7 | 26.10.1990 | [1991/50] | WO1990EP01904 | Priority number, date | DE19893942315 | 21.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3942315 | [1991/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109588 | Date: | 11.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460127 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0460127 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
C09B51/00 (EP);
A61K8/046 (EP);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/418 (EP);
A61Q5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/50] | Title | German: | SCHAUMFÖRMIGES HAARTÖNUNGSMITTEL | [1991/50] | English: | HAIR TONING AGENT IN FOAM FORM | [1991/50] | French: | COLORANT CAPILLAIRE SOUS FORME DE MOUSSE | [1991/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0184061 [ ] (WELLA AG [DE]); | EP0150765 [ ] (WELLA AG [DE]); | EP0182330 [ ] (WELLA AG [DE]) |