EP0450058 - DISPLAY PANEL FOR A VEHICLE WINDSHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIBBEY-OWENS-FORD CO. 811 Madison Avenue Toledo, OH 43695 / US | [1991/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Brian, E. 2821-119th Street Toledo, OH 43611 / US | 02 /
GREENBERG, William, M. 3250 Dogwood Drive Oregon, OH 43616 / US | [1992/12] |
Former [1991/41] | 01 /
COHEN, Brian, E. 2321-119th Street Toledo, OH 43611 / US | ||
02 /
GREENBERG, William, M. 3250 Dogwood Drive Oregon, OH 43616 / US | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90917161.3 | 15.10.1990 | [1991/41] | WO1990US05901 | Priority number, date | US19890422141 | 16.10.1989 Original published format: US 422141 | US19900587459 | 27.09.1990 Original published format: US 587459 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9106031 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0450058 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/00 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
B32B17/10568 (EP);
G02B27/14 (KR);
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/10761 (EP);
G02B27/0101 (EP);
G02B2027/012 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1991/41] | G02B27/14, G02B5/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, SE [1991/43] |
Former [1991/41] | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, SE | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGWINDSCHEIBE | [1991/41] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL FOR A VEHICLE WINDSHIELD | [1991/41] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE POUR PARE-BRISE DE VEHICULE | [1991/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1991 | Search fee paid | 07.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP47012356B ; | [A]JP60023462 ; | [A]JP6223016 ; | [A]JP6088925 ; | [A]JP6145218 ; | [E]EP0420228 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [Y]US3899241 (MALOBICKY JR RUDOLPH L, et al); | [Y]US1834017 (CARBONARA VICTOR E); | [A]BE848277 ; | [A]DE2420355 (MONSANTO CO); | [A]EP0278395 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [A]EP0229876 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]); | [A]WO8601598 (SWEDLOW INC [US]); | [A]FR2569863 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]); | [AD]US3708386 (ALEXANDER H, et al); | [AD]US4287107 (HERMANN HANS D, et al) | [A] - Week 7216, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP-B-47 012 356 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS), & JP47012356B B 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 138 (C-286) & JP-A-60 023 462 ( HITACHI ) 6 February 1985, & JP60023462 A 19850206 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 201 (P-590)(2648) 30 June 1987 & JP-A-62 23 016 ( SHIMAZU ), & JP6223016 A 19870630 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 236 (P-390)(1959) 21 September 1985 & JP-A-60 88 925 ( TOYOTA ), & JP6088925 A 19850921 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 202 (P-477)(2258) 15 July 1986 & JP-A-61 45 218 ( NISSAN ), & JP6145218 A 19860715 | International search | [Y]US3899241 (MALOBICKY JR RUDOLPH L, et al); | [Y]US3912440 (KOSS GEORGE A, et al); | [A]US4325609 (ALFORD STEVEN D); | [A]US3900673 (MATTIMOE PAUL T, et al); | [A]JPS63311201 (MARK KK); | [A]US4694332 (UCHIDA SATORU [JP]); | [A]US4943140 (WOODARD FLOYD E [US], et al); | [Y]US4787711 (SUZUKI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) |