EP0452470 - WOUND GEL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCOTT PAPER COMPANY Scott Plaza 2 Philadelphia, PA 19113 / US | [1991/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOGART, Larry 1221 Greentree Lane Penn Valley, PA 19072 / US | 02 /
BURNS, Raymond, R. 107 Navaho Court Newark, DE 19702 / US | 03 /
FELICE, Margaret, M. 5200 Hilltop 022 Brookhaven, PA 19015 / US | 04 /
PIPPIN, Wallace, H. 201 Royalview Drive West Chester, PA 19382 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Goetz, Rupert, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/43] | Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90917252.0 | 12.10.1990 | [1991/43] | WO1990US05681 | Priority number, date | US19890428156 | 27.10.1989 Original published format: US 428156 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9106323 | Date: | 16.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452470 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0452470 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61L25/00 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
A61L26/009 (EP,US);
A61L24/00 (KR);
A61L26/0014 (EP,US);
A61L26/0023 (EP,US);
A61L26/0066 (EP,US);
A61L26/008 (EP,US);
A61L2300/414 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L26/0014, C08L33/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | GELWUNDVERBANDSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN GEBRAUCH | [1991/43] | English: | WOUND GEL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USING THEM | [1991/43] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE GELS DE CICATRISATION DE LESIONS ET LEURS MODES D'EMPLOI | [1991/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/43] | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.1998 | CH | 11.03.1998 | LI | 11.03.1998 | NL | 11.03.1998 | LU | 12.10.1998 | ES | 13.10.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
CH | 11.03.1998 | ||
LI | 11.03.1998 | ||
NL | 11.03.1998 | ||
LU | 12.10.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
CH | 11.03.1998 | ||
LI | 11.03.1998 | ||
NL | 11.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
CH | 11.03.1998 | ||
LI | 11.03.1998 | ||
LU | 31.10.1998 | ||
Former [1998/50] | AT | 11.03.1998 | |
CH | 11.03.1998 | ||
LI | 11.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 11.03.1998 | Cited in | International search | EP0095892 [ ] (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]); | WO8400111 [ ] (SMITH ROBERT ALAN, et al); | EP0168917 [ ] (FERREIRA LLOYD A); | US4732755 [ ] (GRANA LUIS [US]); | EP0312208 [ ] (ETHICON INC [US]) | by applicant | US4393048 | WO8400111 | US4524064 | US4584188 | US4587284 | US4604384 | US4671267 | US4732755 | EP0312208 |