EP0459075 - Solar roundabout [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petz, Peter Siedlungsstrasse 44 D-86551 Aichach / DE | [1991/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1994/14] | Gallo, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. L. Fleuchaus Dipl.-Phys. H. Schroeter Dipl.-Ing K. Lehmann, Dipl.-Ing.W. Wehser Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/49] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl. Phys. Helmut Schroeter, Dipl. Ing. Leo Fleuchaus, Dipl. Ing. Klaus Lehmann, Dipl. Ing. Wulf Wehser, Dipl. Ing. Wolfgang Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100024.8 | 02.01.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | DE19900006175U | 31.05.1990 Original published format: DE 9006175 U | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459075 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459075 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A63G1/10 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
A63G1/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI [1991/49] | Title | German: | Solarkarussell | [1991/49] | English: | Solar roundabout | [1991/49] | French: | Manège solaire | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/30] | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2107317 ; | [X]DE8914811U |