EP0436494 - Improved reel spring for magnetic tape cassettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOLLER MANUFACTURING CORPORATION (a Wisconsin corporation) 6800 West Calumet Road P.O. Box 23179 Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states KOLLER MANUFACTURING CORPORATION (a Wisconsin corporation) 6800 West Calumet Road P.O. Box 23179 Milwaukee Wisconsin 53223 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carroll, Michael W. 3008 Hidden Lake Road Mequon, Wisconsin 53092 / US | [1991/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91100119.6 | 02.01.1991 | [1991/28] | Priority number, date | US19900460015 | 02.01.1990 Original published format: US 460015 | [1991/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0436494 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0436494 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/087 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
G11B23/08728 (EP,US);
G11B23/08721 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/28] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Spulenfeder für magnetische Bandkassetten | [1991/28] | English: | Improved reel spring for magnetic tape cassettes | [1991/28] | French: | Ressort de bobine amélioré pour cassette à bande magnétique | [1991/28] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/14] | 18.11.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0283560 (CARROLL WILLIAM MICHAEL); | [A]DE8903934U ; | [A]EP0291749 (CARROLL WILLIAM MICHAEL); | [A]EP0272556 (ATB SPA [IT]); | [A]GB2151583 (BASF AG) |