EP0442258 - Process for the preparation of a polyunsaturated olefin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states FIRMENICH SA 1, route des Jeunes CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaudin, Jean-Marc 120,rue du Parc F-74100 Annemasse / FR | 02 /
Morel, Cédric Chemin du Velours, 18A CH-1231 Conches / CH | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Salvadori, Giuseppe c/o Firmenich S.A. Case Postale 239 1211 Genève 8 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Salvadori, Giuseppe, Dr. c/o Firmenich S.A. Case Postale 239 CH-1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 91100222.8 | 09.01.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | CH19900000487 | 15.02.1990 Original published format: CH 48790 | [1991/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442258 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442258 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C11/21, C07C1/30 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
C07C11/21 (EP);
C07C1/30 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C1/30, C07C11/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1991/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer mehrfach ungesättigten Verbindung | [1991/34] | English: | Process for the preparation of a polyunsaturated olefin | [1991/34] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une oléfine polyinsaturée | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/37] | 25.04.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1429284 ; | [AD]EP0203615 | [XP] - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, vol 31, no. 40, 24 septembre 1990, pages 5749-5752, Pergamon Press plc, Oxford, GB; J.-M. GAUDIN et al.: "Two new stereoselective syntheses of (3E,5Z)-1,3,5-undecatriene" |