EP0438078 - Iontophoresis device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rossi, Cino Via Settala 32 I-00123 Roma / IT | For all designated states Eruzzi, Silvio Via A. Mori 23 I-46100 Mantova / IT | [1991/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91100236.8 | 09.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | IT19900040007 | 15.01.1990 Original published format: IT 4000790 | IT19900021107 | 27.07.1990 Original published format: IT 2110790 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0438078 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0438078 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438078 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/30, A61N25/00 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
A61N1/306 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/30] | A61N1/30, A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Iontophoresegerät | [1991/30] | English: | Iontophoresis device | [1991/30] | French: | Appareil d'iontophorèse | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 27.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3324847 (ZOUMBOULIS ELIAS G); | [A]FR2516388 (CARNE PIERRE [FR]); | [X]DE3809815 (ZIMMER PETER [DE], et al) |